Bloom, Hy (CPSO#: 54138)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: Bloom, Hyman (used until: 23 Sep 2009 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1100
1200 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5R 2A5
Phone: (416) 922-7222
Fax: (416) 922-3188
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1989 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HY BLOOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOOM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1985