Bloom, Ira Murray (CPSO#: 50169)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bloom Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Hughes ( CPSO# 52678 )
Dr. I. Bloom ( CPSO# 50169 )

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 14 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IRA MURRAY BLOOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOOM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1981 to 14 Jun 1982
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 31 Dec 1988
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1989 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1983