Bloom, Kenneth Roland (CPSO#: 27751)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 22 Nov 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 1975
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 04 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2008