Bloom, Michael Lawrence (CPSO#: 54114)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 850
Mount Sinai Medical Center
4302 Alton Road
Miami Beach FL  33140
United States
Phone: (305) 532-2999

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 22 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL LAWRENCE BLOOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOOM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1985