Bloom, Scott William (CPSO#: 67762)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 05 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2002
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 05 Aug 2010