Bloomberg, Gary Bernard (CPSO#: 32045)

Current Status: Active Member as of 27 Jul 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Witwatersrand, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Metro Cardiology
4900 Kingsway
Suite 103
Burnaby BC  V5H 2E3
Phone: (604) 439-1277
Fax: (604) 439-1276
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit B27
Eua Claire Market
Mail Box 182
200 Barclay Parade S W
Calgary AB  T2P 4R5
Canada
Phone: (403) 261-0080
Fax: (403) 261-0016
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective: 05 Dec 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GARY BERNARD BLOOMBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOOMBERG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 1980