Blostein, Mark Daniel (CPSO#: 63267)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Aug 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Aug 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 04 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 16 Nov 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 26 Oct 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2003