Blouin, Annie-Claude (CPSO#: 102531)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 06 Feb 2014 to 07 Feb 2014
Elective Trainee - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Jan 2017
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017