Blouin, Danielle (CPSO#: 63789)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 May 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 May 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 2368
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Danielle Blouin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Blouin ( CPSO# 63789 )

Business Address:
Department of Emergency Medicine
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2368

Business Address:
144 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 546-1240

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELLE BLOUIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOUIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 1997
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Nov 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2002