Blouin, Gilles (CPSO#: 23546)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 17 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 16 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Apr 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Jul 2012