Blum, Seymour Jacob (CPSO#: 29105)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective: 25 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 2009