Blumenfeld, Aaron Jay (CPSO#: 75008)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
27 Roncesvalles Avenue, Suite 308
Toronto ON  M6R 3B2
Phone: (416) 534-6699
Fax: (416) 534-0172
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Connecticut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON JAY BLUMENFELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLUMENFELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005