Blumenthal, Andrea Lee (CPSO#: 68967)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 433-2733
Fax: (905) 721-6122
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrea Blumenthal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Blumenthal ( CPSO# 68967 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 433-2733

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Genetics Effective: 01 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA LEE BLUMENTHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLUMENTHAL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Genetics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2002