Blumer, Ian Ray (CPSO#: 50482)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 May 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Baywood Centre
Suite 401
95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone: (905) 427-2678
Fax: (905) 427-2679
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian Blumer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Blumer ( CPSO# 50482 )

Business Address:
The Baywood Centre
401 - 95 Bayly Street West
Ajax ON  L1S 7K8
Phone Number: (905) 427-2678

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 09 Apr 2015 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN RAY BLUMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLUMER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 1985