Blundell, Grahame Elmslie (CPSO#: 22203)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 03 Nov 1975 RCPSC Specialist
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 21 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Feb 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Apr 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jul 2006