Blundell, Ross Stephen (CPSO#: 29637)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: St Michaels Hospital 30 Bond Street Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Date Received: 31 Mar 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016