Blunt, Marie Elizabeth (CPSO#: 57251)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bluewater Health
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: (519) 464-4400
Electoral District: 01

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 03 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIE ELIZABETH BLUNT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLUNT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1988