Blydt-Hansen, Tom David (CPSO#: 65291)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 16 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 05 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Other - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jul 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Aug 2002
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Aug 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Aug 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Aug 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 21 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Aug 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Aug 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2014