Boafo, Addo (CPSO#: 50481)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Aug 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Univ of Ghana, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C H E O
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2507
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Boafo Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Boafo ( CPSO# 50481 )

Business Address:
C H E O
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ADDO BOAFO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOAFO is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 1983