Boate, Brian William (CPSO#: 50483)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1978

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 406
1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone: (613) 725-2882
Fax: (613) 725-1138
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brian Boate Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Boate ( CPSO# 50483 )

Business Address:
406 - 1081 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4G2
Phone Number: (613) 725-2882

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 06 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN WILLIAM BOATE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOATE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 1984