Bobba, Raja Sekhar (CPSO#: 71153)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 610
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone: (905) 308-8319
Fax: (905) 523-8466
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Raja Bobba Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bobba ( CPSO# 71153 )

Business Address:
Suite 610
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8Y 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 308-8319

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Chedoke Hospital Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 23 Sep 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJA SEKHAR BOBBA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOBBA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2000 to 31 Dec 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2001 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 12 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 13 Aug 2002 to 12 Aug 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 13 Aug 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 12 Aug 2005
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 2003