Bobek, Catherine Genovefa (CPSO#: 106352)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 23 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Providence Care Centre
Mental Health Services
Postal Bag 603
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone: (613) 546-1101
Electoral District: 06

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE GENOVEFA BOBEK shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BOBEK is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. BOBEK shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BOBEK is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BOBEK shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BOBEK is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BOBEK no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 22 Sep 2015
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018