Bocchini, Renato (CPSO#: 58920)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Genova, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1990 to 31 Dec 1990
Clinical Fellow - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Visitor Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1988