Bocking, Alan Dixon (CPSO#: 31394)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Mount Sinai Hospital Health Records Department 600 University Avenue Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Date Received: 12 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 02 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Mar 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017