Bocking, John Kenneth (CPSO#: 29009)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. John Kenneth Bocking Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 13 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 11 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 26 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Mar 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Dec 2010