Boddam, David Randall (CPSO#: 55323)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
263 Lakeshore Rd
Brighton ON  K0K 1H0
Phone: (705) 321-3205
Fax: (613) 475-5621
Electoral District: 06
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

239 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 3X2
Canada
Phone: 613 392 1843
Fax: 613 392 2084
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

1 Yukon Lane
Toronto ON  M3K 0A1
Canada
Phone: 4166336200
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 29 May 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID RANDALL BODDAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BODDAM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 1986