Bodhinayake, Janani Rebecca (CPSO#: 111219)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Dec 2016

Expiry Date:  01 Nov 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 05 Dec 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
491 Church Street
Toronto ON  M4Y 2C6
Phone: 4164631500
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Dec 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Nov 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 05 Dec 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Janani Rebecca Bodhinayake may practise family medicine at 491 Church
                  Street,  in  Toronto,  Ontario,  while under supervision coordinated by a
                  supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires  three  years from
                  the date of issuance.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor  notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Bodhinayake's knowledge,  skill,  judgment  or  attitude,  does not
                        provide the required reports to the College by the due date  or  if
                        the reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue to
                        supervise Dr. Bodhinayake's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  December 5, 2016 and currently has  an
                  interim  expiry  date  of November 1, 2018.   The  expiry  date  of  this
                  certificate may be extended,  subject  to the limitations in paragraphs 2
                  and 3 above.