Bodie, Gregory Alexander (CPSO#: 89544)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
390 Steeles Ave West
Unit 11 & 12
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Phone: 905 882 6566
Fax: 905 882 6567
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G.A. Bodie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bodie ( CPSO# 89544 )

Business Address:
Units 11 & 12
390 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 882-6566

Business Address:
9th Floor
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6119

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GREGORY ALEXANDER BODIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BODIE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2016