Bodok, Rebecca (CPSO#: 71902)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: Bodok-Nutzati, Rebecca (used until: 09 Sep 2008 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
8 QUEEN STREET NORTH
Bolton ON  L7E 1C8
Phone: (905) 951-1173
Fax: (905) 951-9716
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

9901 keele street unit 109
Maple ON  L6A 3Y5
Canada
Phone: (905) 951-3428 Ext. 22
Fax: (905) 951-9716
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rebecca Bodok Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bodok ( CPSO# 71902 )

Business Address:
109 - 9901 Keele Street East
Maple ON  L6A 3Y5
Phone Number: (905) 951-3428

Business Address:
8 Queen Street North
Bolton ON  L7E 1C8
Phone Number: (905) 951-1173

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REBECCA BODOK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BODOK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1999