Boerner, Scott Lee (CPSO#: 60815)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Nov 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11E218
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3706
Fax: (416) 340-5517
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SCOTT LEE BOERNER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOERNER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1991