Boersma, John Robert Maria (CPSO#: 52780)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 21
346 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone: (613) 623-0311
Fax: (613) 623-4095
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Boersma Morrison Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Morrison ( CPSO# 52753 )
Dr. J. Boersma ( CPSO# 52780 )

Business Address:
Suite 21
346 John Street North
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Phone Number: (613) 623-0311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ROBERT MARIA BOERSMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOERSMA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1984