Bogart, Michael Charles (CPSO#: 50174)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1985
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2004

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 15 Jun 2001
Summary:

On June 15, 2001, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Bogart guilty of professional misconduct based on the allegations in the 
notice of hearing (that he was found guilty of an offence relevant    to his suitability to practise that being defrauding the 
Crown of the Province of Ontario as represented by the Ministry of Health of a sum of monies of a value exceeding $5,000 
contrary to the Criminal Code and for engaging in disgraceful, dishonourable, or unprofessional conduct) and ordered the 
following: 
 
(a)   Dr. Bogart be reprimanded and that the reprimand be recorded on the register. 
 
(b)   The Registrar is directed to suspend Dr. Bogart s certificate of registration for a period of eighteen (18) months to 
      commence no later than August 1, 2001, six (6) months to be suspended if the following conditions are met: 
 
            (i)   To the best of his ability, he identifies all the patients for which he submitted false billings to OHIP 
            and provides a list of said patients to the Registrar; 
      (ii)  Sends a registered personal letter to each patient where possible, containing an apology for using their 
            name and OHIP number in fraudulent billing and listing the fraudulent charges against their OHIP number; 
      (iii) A copy of these letters and the registration receipts are to be forwarded to the Registrar; and 
      (iv)  The names of patients who are deceased or unable to be contacted are to be listed along with the false 
            charges and their OHIP numbers.    A copy of this list is to be sent to the Registrar of the College. 
 
(c)   For the length of time necessary to complete full restitution, and for 3 years after, Dr. Bogart s OHIP billings will be 
      monitored on a quarterly basis by the College.    For that purpose, it is further ordered that Dr. Bogart direct OHIP to 
      release to the Registrar of the College on a quarterly basis all records relating to Dr. Bogart s billings for that period. 
 
      The Registrar shall appoint an inspector to conduct such quarterly inspections in accordance with a plan to be 
      approved by the Registrar. 
 
      The costs of monitoring by the College to be paid by Dr. Bogart to the maximum amount of $1,000.00 per inspection, 
      to be paid within 30 days of receipt of an account from the College. 
 
(d)   Dr. Bogart shall direct OHIP to release to the Registrar of the College, when requested, confirmation of the status of 
      his restitution payments and the remaining amount owing. 
 
(e)   Dr. Bogart to pay the costs of this proceeding in the amount of $15,000.00. 
       

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Abandoned
Appeal Decision Date: 07 Jul 2003
Hearing Date(s): 14 Jun 2001

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: July 21, 2004
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On July 21, 2004, Dr. Michael Charles Bogart signed the following undertaking:

I, Dr. Michael Charles Bogart, undertake to resign from the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, no later than August 9, 2004.

I promise not to apply for registration as a physician or for a licence to practise medicine in any jurisdiction.

I consent to this undertaking being entered in the register as information that is available to the public.

I acknowledge that, in exchange for this undertaking, the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario has agreed to withdraw the allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence in the Notice of Hearing dated August 28, 2003, which allegations of professional misconduct are currently pending before the Discipline Committee.

I have obtained independent legal advice before giving this undertaking.

On August 16, 2004, the College withdrew the allegations.