Boghossian, Therese (CPSO#: 71699)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2200 Pratte
Office #128
Saint-Hyacinthe QC  J2S 4B6
Phone: (450) 223-1661
Fax: (450) 223-1324
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Centre Hospitalier Honore-Mercier
2750 boulevard LaFramboise
Saint-Hyacinthe QC  J2S 4Y8
Canada
Phone: (450) 771-3335
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THERESE BOGHOSSIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOGHOSSIAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2004