Bogoch, Earl Raphael (CPSO#: 27797)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Feb 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Feb 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Alberta, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
Suite 800
55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone: (416) 864-5350
Fax: (416) 359-1601
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

800-55 Queen Street East
Toronto, ON
M5C 1R6
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Canada
Phone: 416-864-5350
Fax: 416-359-1610
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St John's Rehabilitation Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EARL RAPHAEL BOGOCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOGOCH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Jul 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1985