Bogue, Lisa Anne (CPSO#: 67862)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
430 Waterloo St.
London ON  N6B 2P2
Phone: (519) 679-3200
Fax: (519) 679-3201
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISA ANNE BOGUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOGUE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Jul 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Jul 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Jul 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1999 to 31 Dec 1999
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1999