Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Bohn, Desmond John (CPSO#: 32105)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Dec 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Dec 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CritiCall Ontario
Unit 200
1725 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9B 1K7
Phone: (289) 396-7000
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Olivia Butler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Bohn ( CPSO# 32105 )
Dr. O. Butler ( CPSO# 50817 )
Dr. V. Bohn ( CPSO# 101303)

Business Address:
Shouldice Hospital
7750 Bayview Avenue
Thornhill ON  L3T 4A3
Phone Number: (905) 889-1125

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 21 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DESMOND JOHN BOHN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOHN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Dec 1980