Boileau, Jean-Francois (CPSO#: 83373)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 24 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 24 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. JF Boileau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 23 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Apr 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Jul 2013