Boileau, Nathalie (CPSO#: 61375)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 25 Oct 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jul 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1993
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 25 Oct 1999