Boily, Jean-Claude (CPSO#: 78781)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Sep 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
292 Montreal Road
Suite 200
Ottawa ON  K1L 6B7
Phone: (613) 745-5651
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean-Claude Boily Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Boily ( CPSO# 78781 )

Business Address:
200 - 292 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1L 6B7
Phone Number: (613) 745-5651

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEAN-CLAUDE BOILY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOILY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2003
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2012