Boimer, Corey (CPSO#: 98137)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham-Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Canada
Phone: 905-683-2320
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Corey Boimer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Boimer ( CPSO# 98137 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Ajax & Pickering
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COREY BOIMER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOIMER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2014