Boissoneau, Mary Lee (CPSO#: 91390)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
132 Bluejay Lane, Mattagami
P.O Box 373
Gogama ON  P0M 1W0
Phone: (705) 531-3127
Fax: 705-531-3128
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

233 8th St.
Cochrane ON  P0L 1C0
Canada
Phone: 705-272-4200
Fax: 705-272-2676
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

700 Ross Ave E.
Timmins ON  P4N 8P2
Canada
Phone: 705-267-2131
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

11 Rea St. N, Suite 202
Timmins ON  P4N 4Z5
Canada
Phone: (705) 531-3127
Fax: 705-531-3128
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Boissoneau Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 29 2013

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY LEE BOISSONEAU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOISSONEAU is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 26 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2013