Boisvert, Mariette (CPSO#: 54529)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2002