Bojanowski, Victoria (CPSO#: 50176)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 28 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Queen's University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Oct 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Feb 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Jul 2016