Bojkovic, Michael Neboisa (CPSO#: 61340)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jan 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Serbian

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Units 104-101
10801 Starkey Road
Seminole FL  33777
United States
Phone: (727) 224-8451
Fax: (727) 541-4913

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Alabama
USA - Alaska
USA - Arizona
USA - Arkansas
USA - California
USA - Colorado
USA - Connecticut
USA - Delaware
USA - District of Columbia
USA - Florida
USA - Georgia
USA - Hawaii
USA - Idaho
USA - Illinois
USA - Indiana
USA - Iowa
USA - Kansas
USA - Kentucky
USA - Maine
USA - Maryland
USA - Massachusetts
USA - Michigan
USA - Minnesota
USA - Mississippi
USA - Missouri
USA - Montana
USA - Nebraska
USA - Nevada
USA - New Hampshire
USA - New Jersey
USA - New Mexico
USA - New York
USA - North Carolina
USA - North Dakota
USA - Ohio
USA - Oklahoma
USA - Oregon
USA - Pennsylvania
USA - Rhode Island
USA - South Carolina
USA - South Dakota
USA - Tennessee
USA - Texas
USA - Utah
USA - Vermont
USA - Virginia
USA - Washington
USA - West Virginia
USA - Wisconsin
USA - Wyoming

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL NEBOISA BOJKOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOJKOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 1990
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2003