Bokhary, Abdul Mohsen Abdul Basit Mohammad (CPSO#: 89388)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 25 Aug 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 26 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011