Bokhary, Nada Ahmed Habiballah (CPSO#: 81319)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 27 Aug 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 28 Aug 2004 to 01 Oct 2004
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2015 to 09 Nov 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 10 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Oct 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2016