Bokhout, Maarten (CPSO#: 30629)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 856
105 Shipley Street
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Phone: (519) 482-3000
Fax: (519) 482-7648
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maarten Bokhout Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 29 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital Goderich
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1979 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAARTEN BOKHOUT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOKHOUT is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Mar 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983