Bokore, Wasira George (CPSO#: 92076)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Nov 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Swahili

Education:University of Dar Es Salaam, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodbine Family Health Team
Suite 120
135 Queens Plate Drive
Toronto ON  M9W 6V1
Phone: (416) 342-5140
Fax: (416) 342-5148
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bokore Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Bokore ( CPSO# 92076 )

Business Address:
Suite 120
135 Queens Plate Drive
Toronto ON  M9W 6V1
Phone Number: (416) 342-5140

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 13 Oct 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WASIRA GEORGE BOKORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOKORE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 16 Jul 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Nov 2010