Bola, Sundeep Singh (CPSO#: 88327)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: 905-472-7000
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Canada
Phone: (416) 282-9119
Fax: 416 282-4141
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

106 Humber College Blvd
Suite 202
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4E4
Canada
Phone: (416) 742-0680
Fax: (416) 742-0681
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 23 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUNDEEP SINGH BOLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2014