Boland, Margaret Patricia (CPSO#: 50177)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 1516
Fax: (613) 738-4854
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Margaret P. Boland Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 30 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Boland ( CPSO# 50177 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 16 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 28 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARGARET PATRICIA BOLAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOLAND is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Other - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Other - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 1982 to 01 Sep 1983
Research Fellows - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Research Fellows - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Research Fellows - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1986 to 31 Aug 1986
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 1986